Jallow et al v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Abdoulie Jallow and Mamie Jallow
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin Riddle and Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 1:2019cv03860
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing action (anc)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPINION AND ORDER granting #4 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 2/21/2020. (anc)
February 24, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (anc)
December 11, 2019 Submission of #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (anc)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY BRIEF re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, Kevin Riddle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order of Removal)(Johnson, Tiffany)
November 29, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Abdoulie Jallow, Mamie Jallow. (Fogle, H.)
November 19, 2019 DOCKET ORDER GRANTING #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Plaintiffs shall have until November 28, 2019 to file their response. Entered at the direction of Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/19/2019. (cmd)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #4 Motion to Dismiss by Mamie Jallow. (Fogle, H.) Modified on 11/19/2019 to add docket relationship and edit entry text. (cmd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Brief In Support by Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, Kevin Riddle. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Administrative Closure, #3 Exhibit 2 - I-130 Approval)(Johnson, Tiffany)
September 5, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #3 Return of Service Executed as to USA: Answer due dates added. (sap)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Mamie Jallow, Abdoulie Jallow. Kenneth Cuccinelli served on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/28/2019; Kevin McAleenan served on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/28/2019; Kevin Riddle served on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Fogle, H.) Modified on 9/5/2019 to add answer due dates and correct filers (sap).
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, Kevin Riddle, Attorney General William Barr, U.S. Attorney Byung Pak. (Attachments: #1 Summons Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, #2 Summons Kevin Riddle, #3 Summons William P. Barr, #4 Summons Byung J. Pak)(tmf)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief filed by Mamie Jallow, Abdoulie Jallow. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-8893041) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jallow et al v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Tiffany Rene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Riddle
Represented By: Tiffany Rene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Tiffany Rene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdoulie Jallow
Represented By: H. Glenn Fogle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mamie Jallow
Represented By: H. Glenn Fogle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?