Abrams v. Merrill et al
Plaintiff: Jared Abrams
Defendant: Brian C. Beazer, Stephen P. Zelnak, Jr., Elizabeth S. Acton, Laurent Alpert, Allan P. Merrill, Robert L. Salomon, Larry T. Solari, Norma A. Provencio, Peter G. Leemputte, Peter M. Orser and Danny R. Shepherd
Petitioner: Beazer Homes USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03868
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by Elizabeth S. Acton, Laurent Alpert, Brian C. Beazer, Beazer Homes USA, Inc., Peter G. Leemputte, Allan P. Merrill, Peter M. Orser, Norma A. Provencio, Robert L. Salomon, Danny R. Shepherd, Larry T. Solari, Stephen P. Zelnak, Jr. (Pope, B.)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany Marie Rezek on behalf of Elizabeth S. Acton, Laurent Alpert, Brian C. Beazer, Beazer Homes USA, Inc., Peter G. Leemputte, Allan P. Merrill, Peter M. Orser, Norma A. Provencio, Robert L. Salomon, Danny R. Shepherd, Larry T. Solari, Stephen P. Zelnak, Jr (Rezek, Bethany)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by B. Warren Pope on behalf of Elizabeth S. Acton, Laurent Alpert, Brian C. Beazer, Beazer Homes USA, Inc., Peter G. Leemputte, Allan P. Merrill, Peter M. Orser, Norma A. Provencio, Robert L. Salomon, Danny R. Shepherd, Larry T. Solari, Stephen P. Zelnak, Jr (Pope, B.)
September 5, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to attorney Marion C. Passmore re #5 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jta)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Marion C, Passmore. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 9/5/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jta)
September 5, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #2 APPLICATION for Admission of Marion C. Passmore Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8903392). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Marion C. Passmore added appearing on behalf of Jared Abrams (pmb)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Before the Court is Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Local Rule 5.1C requires that all "[p]leadings, motions, and other documents presented to the court for filing must... be prepared in one of the following fonts: Times New Roman (at least 14 point), Courier New (at least 12 point), Century Schoolbook (at least 13 point), or Book Antigua (at least 13 point)." The complaint is written in 12 point, Times New Roman font. The Court NOTIFIES the parties that the Court may strike and not consider any future filings that do not comply with the format requirements of the Local Rules. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to send a copy of this order to Defendants, who have not yet been served. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 9/4/2019. (bgt)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Admission of Marion C. Passmore Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8903392). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Jared Abrams. (Rogovin, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jared Abrams. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8894010) (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abrams v. Merrill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian C. Beazer
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen P. Zelnak, Jr.
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth S. Acton
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurent Alpert
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan P. Merrill
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Salomon
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry T. Solari
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma A. Provencio
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter G. Leemputte
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter M. Orser
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny R. Shepherd
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Beazer Homes USA, Inc.
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Abrams
Represented By: Michael A. Rogovin
Represented By: Marion C. Passmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?