FirstBank v. Burns et al
Plaintiff: FirstBank
Defendant: Sernel S. Burns, II and Lois M. Williams
Case Number: 1:2019cv03959
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Clarence Cooper
Referring Judge: J Clay Fuller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (bjh)
October 9, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of certified Mailing as to Sernel S. Burns, II, FirstBank, Lois M. Williams re #5 Order on Remand, #6 Notice. (bjh)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to Clerk of Magistrate Court of Fayette County re #5 Order of Remand. (bjh)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Adopting #2 Final Report and Recommendation and remanding this case to the Magistrate Court of Fayette County. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to take the necessary steps to effectuate the remand. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 10/9/19. (bjh)
September 24, 2019 Submission of #2 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Notice of Removal, to District Judge Clarence Cooper. (bjh)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 OBJECTIONS to #2 Report and Recommendation filed by Sernel S. Burns, II. (tcc)
September 5, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Sernel S. Burns, II, FirstBank, Lois M. Williams re #2 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #3 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (bjh)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Service of #2 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 9/5/19. (bjh)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Notice of Removal. Because Defendant has failed to show that either federal question or diversity jurisdiction exists, this Court does not have subject matter jurisdiction over thisaction and removal is improper. The undersigned therefore RECOMMENDS thatthis action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fayette County.The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference of this case to theundersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 9/5/19. (bjh)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Sernel S. Burns, II. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number GAN100115364) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FirstBank v. Burns et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sernel S. Burns, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lois M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FirstBank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?