Griner v. Horizon Satellites, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charles Griner
Defendant: Chris Reynolds, Steve Ramsland and Horizon Satellites, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04060
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Charles Griner. (Frisch, Andrew)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. The Plaintiff shall have through including October 30, 2019 to reply to the Motion to Dismiss #4 . Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/24/19. (rlb)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss to Respond by Charles Griner. (Frisch, Andrew)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. The Plaintiff shall have through including October 23, 2019 to reply to the Motion to Dismiss #4 . Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/9/19. (rlb)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss to Respond by Charles Griner. (Frisch, Andrew)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Hearing on #4 Motion for to Dismiss for Tuesday, January 7, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William M. Ray II. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/2/19. (rlb)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Horizon Satellites, Inc., Steve Ramsland, Chris Reynolds. Discovery ends on 2/24/2020.(Godwin, Jason) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Horizon Satellites, Inc., Steve Ramsland, Chris Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Godwin, Jason)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Charles Griner re #1 Complaint, of Filing Consent to Join DG (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join)(Frisch, Andrew)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Horizon Satellites, Inc., Steve Ramsland and Chris Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Summons Steve Ramsland, #2 Summons Chris Reynolds)(jed)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Charles Griner. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8922995) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used- forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griner v. Horizon Satellites, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Reynolds
Represented By: Jason Brian Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Ramsland
Represented By: Jason Brian Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Satellites, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Brian Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Griner
Represented By: Andrew R. Frisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?