Edwards et al v. Bocchicchio et al
Plaintiff: Myrna Edwards and McArthur Edwards
Defendant: Robert Wilkie and A. Bocchicchio
Case Number: 1:2019cv04110
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (bnp)
October 23, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to McArthur Edwards, Myrna Edwards re #6 Order, #7 Clerk's Judgment. (bnp)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing this action without prejudice. (bnp)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court DISMISSES this action WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 10/23/19. (bnp)
October 11, 2019 Submission of #5 Amended Complaint to District Judge Amy Totenberg for frivolity determination. (bnp)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Department of Veterans Affairs filed by McArthur Edwards, Myrna Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Filing Plaintiff Objects to the Frivolous Complaint by McArthur Edwards, Myrna Edwards (bnp)
September 13, 2019 Submission of #3 Complaint for frivolity determination to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
September 13, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to McArthur Edwards, Myrna Edwards re #2 Order. (bnp)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by McArthur Edwards, Myrna Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this matter to the District Judge for a frivolity determination under 1915(e)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 9/13/19. (bnp)
September 13, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (eop)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by McArthur Edwards and Myrna Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards et al v. Bocchicchio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrna Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McArthur Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Bocchicchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?