Save Depot, LLC v. Hussman Corporation
Plaintiff: Save Depot, LLC
Defendant: Hussman Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv04113
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Consent Protective Order. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/8/2019. (tcc)
October 31, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Amended Responses to Defendants Second Continuing Interrogatories by Save Depot, LLC.(Martin, James)
October 30, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Protective Order Consent Protective Order by Hussman Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement to be Bound by Protective Order)(Johnson, Myrece)
October 28, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants Second Interrogatories and Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants Second Request for Production of Documents by Save Depot, LLC.(Martin, James)
October 25, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service of Discovery Material by Hussman Corporation.(Johnson, Myrece)
October 25, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend #1 Notice of Removal, Complaint by Save Depot, LLC. (Martin, James)
October 23, 2019 Filing 16 Amended Initial Disclosures by Hussman Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hussmann's Witness List, #2 Exhibit B - Hussmann's Expert List, #3 Exhibit C - Hussmann's Document List, #4 Exhibit D - Hussmann's Damages List, #5 Exhibit E - Hussmann - Insurance Agreement)(Johnson, Myrece)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal and instructs Defendant to re-file the redacted version of the document. Defendant shall redact only the portion of the document that it asserts contains confidential and proprietary information. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/18/19. (jpa)
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #10 Initial Disclosures, Defendant Hussmann Corporation's Unopposed Motion to Permanently Seal an Inadvertently Filed Document by Hussman Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Johnson, Myrece)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #11 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 6/10/2020. Summary Judgment Motions are due by 6/10/2020. If a dispositive motion is not filed, the Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 7/10/2020. Otherwise, the Consolidated pretrial order will be due thirty days after the Court's ruling on any dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/15/19. (jpa)
October 15, 2019 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons, #3 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed and approved by SDG (kmj)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 Initial Disclosures by Save Depot, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Witness List, #2 Exhibit Expert Witness, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Documents, #4 Exhibit Specification of Damages)(Martin, James)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Hussman Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Johnson, Myrece)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 Initial Disclosures by Hussman Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hussmann Witness List, #2 Exhibit B - Hussmann Expert Witness List, #3 Exhibit C - Hussmann Document List, #4 Exhibit D - Hussmann Damages, #5 FILED UNDER SEAL Exhibit E - Hussmann - Insurance Agreement)(Johnson, Myrece) Modified on 10/21/2019 (jpa).
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for Myrece R. Johnson (Johnson, Myrece)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Marsh, C.)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 10-18-19, 11-22-19, 11-25-19, 11-26-19, 11-27-19, 12-23-19, 12-24-19, 12-25-19,12-26-19, 12-27-19, 12-30-19,12-31-19, 01-01-20, 01-02-20, 01-03-20,01-30-20,01-31-20, 02-27-20, 02-28-20, 03-02-20, 03-03-20, 03-04-20, 03-05-20, 03-06-20, 03-09-20, 03-10-20, 03-11-20, 03-12-20, 03-13-20, 07-06-20, 07-07-20, 07-08-20, 07-09-20, 07-10-20, by C. Bradford Marsh. (Marsh, C.)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): November 15, 25-29, 2019; December 6, 23-27, 30-31, 2019, by Myrece Rebecca Johnson. (Johnson, Myrece) Modified on 10/7/2019 to edit text. (aaq).
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/26/19. (jpa)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Save Depot, LLC. (Martin, James)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hussman Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Panasonic Corporation for Hussman Corporation. (Johnson, Myrece)
September 17, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Steven D. Grimberg. Judge Michael L. Brown no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-4113-SDG. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (dob)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Hussman Corporation. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-8929409) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Exhibit -D, #5 Exhibit -E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Save Depot, LLC v. Hussman Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hussman Corporation
Represented By: Myrece Rebecca Johnson
Represented By: C. Bradford Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Save Depot, LLC
Represented By: James William Martin
Represented By: Bernard Emory Potter
Represented By: James William Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?