America 2030 Capital LLC v. Sunpower Group Unlimited et al
Plaintiff: America 2030 Capital LLC
Defendant: Lau Ping Sum, CDH Investments, Sunpower Group Limited, United Overseas Bank Limited, Chen Kai, Pearce, Li Gang, Ge Cui Xin, Huang Yan, William Hsu, David Lu, PC Lee, Michelle Zhu, The Edge Media Group Pte Ltd, Guo Li, Song Xiaoming, Ong Kooi Tong, Hu Ning, UOB Kay Hian Pte Ltd, Ying Wei, DCP Capital Partners and Jiang Ning
Case Number: 1:2019cv04136
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2019 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Admission of Jaitegh Singh Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by America 2030 Capital LLC. (Coen, Timothy)
November 8, 2019 Submission of #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #6 First MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION for Order - Request for Judicial Notice, #8 MOTION to Dismiss, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (rlb)
November 7, 2019 RETURN of #20 APPLICATION for Admission of Jaitegh Singh Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: petitioner's address. (pmb)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Setting Hearing on #6 Motion to Dismiss, #8 MOTION to Dismiss, #9 Request for Judicial Notice, and #10 Motion to Dismiss for Wednesday, February 12, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William M. Ray II. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/5/19. (rlb)
November 5, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Admission of Jaitegh Singh Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by America 2030 Capital LLC. (Coen, Timothy)
November 1, 2019 RETURN of #19 APPLICATION for Admission of Jaitegh Singh Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9041105). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: courts and address. (pmb)
October 29, 2019 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission of Jaitegh Singh Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9041105). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by America 2030 Capital LLC. (Coen, Timothy)
October 29, 2019 Clerks Notation re #17 Certificate of Interested Persons, - OK per WMR (sll)
October 29, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Anne Marie Bowler re #18 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rlb)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Anne Marie Bowler. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/28/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rlb)
October 28, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by CDH Investments, DCP Capital Partners, Li Gang, William Hsu, Chen Kai, Guo Li, David Lu, Hu Ning, Jiang Ning, Lau Ping Sum, Sunpower Group Limited, Ying Wei, Song Xiaoming, Ge Cui Xin, Huang Yan identifying Corporate Parent CDH Investment Management Company Limited for CDH Investments. (Sinkfield, Richard)
October 28, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Anne Marie Bowler Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9022023). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Anna Marie Bowler added appearing on behalf of UOB Kay Hian Pte Ltd, United Overseas Bank Limited (pmb)
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Anne Marie Bowler Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9022023). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by UOB Kay Hian Pte Ltd, United Overseas Bank Limited. (Mayer, Randolph)
October 22, 2019 RETURN of #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Anne Marie Bowler Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. To attorney for correction. (cdg)
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Anne Marie Bowler Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by UOB Kay Hian Pte Ltd, United Overseas Bank Limited. (Mayer, Randolph)
October 22, 2019 Clerks Notation re #12 Certificate of Interested Persons, #14 Certificate of Interested Persons, #11 Certificate of Interested Persons - OK per WMR (sll)
October 21, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Persons by PC Lee. (Kronenberger, Karl)
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Intent to Rely on Foreign Law by CDH Investments, DCP Capital Partners, Li Gang, William Hsu, Chen Kai, Guo Li, David Lu, Hu Ning, Jiang Ning, Lau Ping Sum, Sunpower Group Limited, Ying Wei, Song Xiaoming, Ge Cui Xin, Huang Yan (Sinkfield, Richard) Modified on 10/22/2019 (rlb).
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons by Ong Kooi Tong. (Kronenberger, Karl)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Edge Media Group Pte Ltd identifying Corporate Parent Phileo Group Limited for The Edge Media Group Pte Ltd. (Kronenberger, Karl)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficient Service of Process, and Failure to State a Claim with Brief In Support by CDH Investments, DCP Capital Partners, Li Gang, William Hsu, Chen Kai, Guo Li, David Lu, Hu Ning, Jiang Ning, Lau Ping Sum, Sunpower Group Limited, Ying Wei, Song Xiaoming, Ge Cui Xin, Huang Yan. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion To Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficient Service of Process, and Failure to State a Claim, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kai Chen on behalf of Sunpower Group Ltd, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Kai Chen, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Ge Cuiping, #5 Exhibit D - Declaration of Jiang Ning, #6 Exhibit E - Declaration of Lau Ping Sum (aka Pearce), #7 Exhibit F - Declaration of William Hsu on behalf of CDH Singapore, #8 Exhibit G - Declaration of William Hsu, #9 Exhibit H - Declaration of Francis Ho, #10 Exhibit I - Declaration of Li Guo, #11 Exhibit J - Declaration of Yan Huang, #12 Exhibit K - Declaration of Xiaoming Song, #13 Exhibit L - Declaration of Wei Ying, #14 Exhibit M - Declaration of Haifeng David Liu on behalf of DCP Capital Partners, #15 Exhibit N - Declaration of Haifeng David Liu, #16 Exhibit O - Declaration of Gang Li, #17 Exhibit P - Affidavit of Service for Sunpower Group Ltd, #18 Exhibit Q - Affidavit of Service for Kai Chen, #19 Exhibit R - Affidavit of Service for Ge Cuiping, #20 Exhibit S - Affidavit of Service for Jiang Ning, #21 Exhibit T - Affidavit of Service for Lau Ping Sum (aka Pearce), #22 Exhibit U - Affidavit of Service for CDH Singapore, #23 Exhibit V - Affidavit of Service for William Hsu, #24 Exhibit W - Affidavit of Service for Francis Ho (Hu Ning), #25 Exhibit X - Affidavit of Service for Li Guo, #26 Exhibit Y - Affidavit of Service for Yan Huang, #27 Exhibit Z - Affidavit of Service for Xiaoming Song, #28 Exhibit AA - Affidavit of Service for Wei Ying, #29 Exhibit AB - Affidavit of Service for Gang Li, #30 Exhibit AC - Singapore Rules of Court - Order 10, #31 Exhibit AD - Singapore Rules of Court - Order 62, #32 Exhibit AE - Singapore Rules of Court - Order 65, #33 Exhibit AF - SGX Rule 703, #34 Exhibit AG - SGX Rule 1406, #35 Exhibit AH - America 2030 Capital Limited SOS Records)(Sinkfield, Richard) Modified on 10/22/2019 (rlb).
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Order - Request for Judicial Notice with Brief In Support by PC Lee, The Edge Media Group Pte Ltd, Ong Kooi Tong. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Karl S. Kronenberger)(Kronenberger, Karl)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by PC Lee, The Edge Media Group Pte Ltd, Ong Kooi Tong. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kooi Ong Tong, #2 Affidavit of PC Lee, #3 Affidavit of Ian Tong)(Kronenberger, Karl)
October 21, 2019 RETURN of #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Anne Marie Bowler Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: payment. (cdg)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the Sunpower, CDH, and DCP Defendants motion for leave to extend the page limitation from 25 pages to 45 pages. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/21/2019. (jed)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by UOB Kay Hian Pte Ltd, United Overseas Bank Limited. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit)(Mayer, Randolph)
October 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by CDH Investments, DCP Capital Partners, Li Gang, William Hsu, Chen Kai, Guo Li, David Lu, Hu Ning, Jiang Ning, Lau Ping Sum, Sunpower Group Limited, Ying Wei, Song Xiaoming, Ge Cui Xin, Huang Yan. (Sinkfield, Richard)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Anne Marie Bowler Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by UOB Kay Hian Pte Ltd, United Overseas Bank Limited. (Mayer, Randolph)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. CDH's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended through and including October 21, 2019. The other Defendants may answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by October 21, 2019, as they may choose. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 9/20/19. (rlb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by CDH Investments. (Laney, Dan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by CDH Investments. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC- 8933484) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- State Court Notice of Filing, #3 Exhibit C- Annual Registration of America 2030 Capital LLC, #4 Exhibit D- Summary America 2030 Capital LLC, #5 Exhibit E- America 2030's Article of Organization, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: America 2030 Capital LLC v. Sunpower Group Unlimited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lau Ping Sum
Represented By: Richard H. Sinkfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDH Investments
Represented By: Cameron Blaine Roberts
Represented By: Catherine Modling Bennett
Represented By: Dan Foster Laney, III
Represented By: Richard H. Sinkfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunpower Group Limited
Represented By: Richard H. Sinkfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Overseas Bank Limited
Represented By: Randolph A. Mayer
Represented By: Anne Marie Bowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chen Kai
Represented By: Richard H. Sinkfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearce
Represented By: Richard H. Sinkfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Li Gang
Represented By: Richard H. Sinkfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ge Cui Xin
Represented By: Richard H. Sinkfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huang Yan
Represented By: Richard H. Sinkfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hsu
Represented By: Richard H. Sinkfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lu
Represented By: Richard H. Sinkfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PC Lee
Represented By: Karl S. Kronenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Zhu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Edge Media Group Pte Ltd
Represented By: Karl S. Kronenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guo Li
Represented By: Richard H. Sinkfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Song Xiaoming
Represented By: Richard H. Sinkfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ong Kooi Tong
Represented By: Karl S. Kronenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hu Ning
Represented By: Richard H. Sinkfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UOB Kay Hian Pte Ltd
Represented By: Randolph A. Mayer
Represented By: Anne Marie Bowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ying Wei
Represented By: Richard H. Sinkfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCP Capital Partners
Represented By: Richard H. Sinkfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jiang Ning
Represented By: Richard H. Sinkfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: America 2030 Capital LLC
Represented By: Timothy F. Coen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?