Harris et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Harris and Ertha Harris
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA, American Servicing Company and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NA
Case Number: 1:2019cv04179
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Referring Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Submission of the #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (aaq)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process filed by American Servicing Company, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NA. (Ebbs, Arthur)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process filed by Daniel Harris, Ertha Harris. (tcc)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Disclosures by Daniel Harris, Ertha Harris.(tcc)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Servicing Company, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NA identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company (WFC) for American Servicing Company, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NA. (Ebbs, Arthur)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process with Brief In Support by American Servicing Company, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Security Deed, #2 Exhibit B - Assignments)(Ebbs, Arthur)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Daniel Harris, Ertha Harris. Wells Fargo Bank, NA served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (jpa)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (eop)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Daniel Harris and Ertha Harris. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number GAN100115740) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ertha Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Represented By: Arthur Allen Ebbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Servicing Company
Represented By: Arthur Allen Ebbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NA
Represented By: Arthur Allen Ebbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?