Fulton Allen Road Associates, LLC v. Williams
Plaintiff: Fulton Allen Road Associates, LLC
Defendant: Shaquana Williams
Case Number: 1:2019cv04221
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 Mail sent to Fulton Allen Road Associates, LLC re #5 Order Returned as Undeliverable. (rjs)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 Case electronically remanded to Magistrate Court of Fulton County. (rjs)
October 28, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (rjs)
October 28, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Fulton Allen Road Associates, LLC, Shaquana Williams re #5 Order. (rjs)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER adopting #3 Final Report and Recommendation as the Opinion and Order of this Court. This civil action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County, Georgia. It is further ORDERED that in the event Defendant Shaquana Williams attempts to remove another dispossessory action to federal court, she may be required to post a cash or corporate security bond or sanctions may be considered and/or imposed. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 10/28/2019. (rjs)
October 15, 2019 Submission of the #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (aaq)
September 24, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Fulton Allen Road Associates, LLC, Shaquana Williams re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (rjs)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 9/24/2019. (rjs)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (found in the #3 R&R) granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 9/24/2019. (rjs)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal RECOMMENDING that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County, Georgia for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. By now, Ms. Williams must be fully aware that state court eviction cases like the current one are not properly removable to federal court. It is recommended that in the event Ms. Williams attempts to remove another dispossessory action to federal court, that she be required to post a cash or corporate security bond or that sanctions be considered and/or imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 9/24/2019. (rjs)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Shaquana Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 23, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (eop)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Shaquana Williams. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fulton Allen Road Associates, LLC v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fulton Allen Road Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaquana Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?