Micro Balance Health Products, LLC et al v. Collado
Plaintiff: Micro Balance Health Products, LLC and Dr. Donald Dennis
Defendant: Cesar Collado
Case Number: 1:2019cv04230
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 Court's NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES.(pdw)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #6 Counterclaim by Dennis Surgical Center, LLC, Dr. Donald Dennis, Micro Balance Health Products, LLC.(Sugarman, F.) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Cesar Collado. Dennis Surgical Center, LLC served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Hopkins, J.)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by Dr. Donald Dennis, Micro Balance Health Products, LLC. (Sugarman, F.)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by Cesar Collado. (Hopkins, J.)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 3/16/2020.), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand by Cesar Collado.(Hopkins, J.) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 1, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Register of Copyrights re #5 A.O. Form 121 Copyright. (rjs)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (rjs)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Micro Balance Health Products, LLC, Dr. Donald Dennis. Cesar Collado served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Sugarman, F.)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED AO 121 . (Sugarman, F.)
September 19, 2019 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (jed)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cesar Collado. (jed)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Micro Balance Health Products, LLC, Dr. Donald Dennis. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC- 8947773) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used- forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Micro Balance Health Products, LLC et al v. Collado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micro Balance Health Products, LLC
Represented By: William Caleb Gross
Represented By: Marisa Ugalde Sugarman
Represented By: Matthew G. Hawk
Represented By: F. Skip Sugarman
Represented By: Shara Garwood Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Donald Dennis
Represented By: William Caleb Gross
Represented By: Marisa Ugalde Sugarman
Represented By: Matthew G. Hawk
Represented By: F. Skip Sugarman
Represented By: Shara Garwood Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cesar Collado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?