Gibson v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Harold Phil Gibson, Jr.
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and PennyMac Loan Services, LLC,
Case Number: 1:2019cv04262
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: John K Larkins
Referring Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant PennyMac Loan Services, LLC pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (sap)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal PennyMac Loan Services, LLC filed by Harold Phil Gibson, Jr (Sieg, Paul)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Harold Phil Gibson, Jr. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, waiver mailed on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Sieg, Paul)
October 21, 2019 Clerk's Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons: OK, per TWT. (cmd)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Harold Phil Gibson, Jr. (Sieg, Paul)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Harold Phil Gibson, Jr. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver mailed on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Sieg, Paul)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Harold Phil Gibson, Jr. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC- 8950998) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Phil Gibson, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Berry
Represented By: Adam Klein
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Sieg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?