Edge La Vista Walk, LLC v. Hill
Plaintiff: Edge La Vista Walk, LLC
Defendant: Deante Hill
Case Number: 1:2019cv04444
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 Receipt of Electronic filing of the #6 Order to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. (jpa)
November 8, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Edge La Vista Walk, LLC, Deante Hill re #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (jpa)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting #3 Final Report and Recommendation. The Court REMANDS this action to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 11/6/19. (jpa)
November 6, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (jpa)
November 6, 2019 Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpa)
October 15, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Edge La Vista Walk, LLC and Deante Hill as to Edge La Vista Walk, LLC, Deante Hill regarding #5 Order. (mlb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
October 15, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Edge La Vista Walk, LLC, Deante Hill re #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (jpa)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 10/15/19. (jpa)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order (Found in #3 R&R) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 10/15/19. (jpa)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal. The Court RECOMMENDS that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 10/15/19. (jpa)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Deante Hill. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 7, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (eop)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Deante Hill. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Notice of Removal and Federal Stay, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edge La Vista Walk, LLC v. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edge La Vista Walk, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deante Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?