Rayan v. Saul et al
Plaintiff: Maha Z. Rayan
Defendant: Andrew Marshall Saul and Christopher G. Harris
Case Number: 1:2019cv04475
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff Maha Z. Rayan's Motion to Vacate Orders Doc. #9 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 11/27/19. (jta)
November 27, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Maha Z. Rayan re #10 Order on Motion to Vacate. (jta)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). (jta)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: for the reasons discussed in the Court's November 1, 2019, Order Doc. #6 , it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff Maha Z. Rayan's claims for violations of Section 552a(g)(l)(C) of the Privacy Act and Section 1106 of the Social Security Act are DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 11/25/19. (jta)
November 25, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Maha Z. Rayan re #7 Order. (jta)
November 25, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (jta)
November 25, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Maha Z. Rayan re #8 Clerk's Judgment. (jta)
November 25, 2019 Submission of #9 MOTION to Vacate #2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 Order,to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (jta)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Vacate #2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 Order,by Maha Z. Rayan. (Attachments: #1 Judge Cohen's Order, #2 Exhibits)(jta)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds that Plaintiff has failed to state claims for fraud, violation of the Privacy Act, violation of Section 1106 of the Social Security Act, and Aggravated Identity Theft. The Court further finds that it lacks subject-matter jurisdiction over Plaintiffs violation of the Freedom of Information Act claim. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims for fraud, violation of the Freedom of Information Act, and violation of Sections 552a(g)(l)(A) & (D) of the Privacy Act are DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall be granted twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order to file an Amended Complaint properly asserting a claim for violations of Section 552a(g)(l)(C) of the Privacy Act and Section 1106 of the Social Security Act against the Social Security Administration. If Plaintiff fails to do so, this claim will also be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). It is further ORDERED that Christopher G. Harris is DISMISSED as a party defendant. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 11/1/19. (jta)
November 1, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Maha Z. Rayan re #6 Order. (jta)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 Objections to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Court Judge, Justin S. Anand and Prompt Motion by Maha Z. Rayan (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(jdb) Modified on 10/31/2019 to include motion (jdb).
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/9/2019. (adg)
October 9, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Maha Z. Rayan re #4 Order. (adg)
October 9, 2019 Submission of #3 Complaint for a frivolity determination, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (adg)
October 9, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Maha Z. Rayan re #2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (adg)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Maha Z. Rayan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to refrain from forwarding the Complaint to the United States Marshal's Service for service until the District Judge orders otherwise. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this matter to the District Court for a frivolity determination under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 10/8/2019. (adg)
October 8, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (eop)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Maha Z. Rayan. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rayan v. Saul et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Marshall Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher G. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maha Z. Rayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?