LBH Engineers, LLC v. Archer Western Contractors, LLC et al
Plaintiff: LBH Engineers, LLC
Defendant: Archer Western Construction, LLC, Parsons Corporation, Northwest Express Roadbuilders, David Head, Georgia Department of Transportation, Hubbard Construction Company, Parsons Transportation Group Inc., Archer Western Contractors, LLC, State Road and Tollway Authority and Heath & Lineback Engineers, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04477
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 60 Certificate of Interested Persons by Heath & Lineback Engineers, Inc.. (Mack, Tawny)
December 2, 2019 Filing 59 Defendant Heath & Lineback Engineers, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff LBH Engineers, LLC's Complaint ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Heath & Lineback Engineers, Inc..(Mack, Tawny) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 2, 2019 Filing 58 Certificate of Interested Persons by Parsons Corporation, Parsons Transportation Group Inc.. (Artzer, James)
December 2, 2019 Filing 57 Defendants Parsons Transportation Group, Inc.'s and Parsons Corporation's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand , First COUNTERCLAIM against LBH Engineers, LLC with Jury Demand by Parsons Corporation, Parsons Transportation Group Inc..(Artzer, James) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 2, 2019 Filing 56 APPLICATION for Admission of Eric D. Hayes Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9141929). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Archer Western Construction, LLC, Archer Western Contractors, LLC. (Achey, Wesley)
December 2, 2019 Filing 55 APPLICATION for Admission of Adam M. Kaufmann Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9141928). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Archer Western Construction, LLC, Archer Western Contractors, LLC. (Achey, Wesley)
December 2, 2019 Filing 54 Certificate of Interested Persons by Northwest Express Roadbuilders. (Achey, Wesley)
December 2, 2019 Filing 53 Certificate of Interested Persons by Hubbard Construction Company. (Achey, Wesley)
December 2, 2019 Filing 52 Certificate of Interested Persons by Archer Western Contractors, LLC. (Achey, Wesley)
December 2, 2019 Filing 51 Certificate of Interested Persons by Archer Western Construction, LLC. (Achey, Wesley)
December 2, 2019 Filing 50 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Northwest Express Roadbuilders.(Achey, Wesley) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 2, 2019 Filing 49 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Hubbard Construction Company.(Achey, Wesley) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 2, 2019 Filing 48 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Archer Western Contractors, LLC.(Achey, Wesley) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 2, 2019 Filing 47 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Archer Western Construction, LLC. Discovery ends on 8/28/2020.(Achey, Wesley) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 2, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Cameron Achey on behalf of Archer Western Construction, LLC, Archer Western Contractors, LLC (Achey, Wesley)
November 27, 2019 Submission of #31 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(1), #32 MOTION to Stay Discovery, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (tmf)
November 26, 2019 Filing 45 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew S. Harris Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9128745). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Parsons Corporation, Parsons Transportation Group Inc.. (Artzer, James)
November 26, 2019 Filing 44 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael K. Leachman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9128695). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Parsons Corporation, Parsons Transportation Group Inc.. (Artzer, James)
November 26, 2019 Filing 43 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey J. Philllips Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9128634). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Parsons Corporation, Parsons Transportation Group Inc.. (Artzer, James)
November 25, 2019 Filing 42 REPLY BRIEF re #31 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(1) Defendants Georgia Department of Transportation's and State Road and Tollway Authority's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) filed by Georgia Department of Transportation, State Road and Tollway Authority. (Volkert, Mary Josephine)
November 25, 2019 Filing 41 REPLY BRIEF re #32 MOTION to Stay Discovery Defendants Georgia Department of Transportation's and State Road and Tollway Authority's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Georgia Department of Transportation, State Road and Tollway Authority. (Volkert, Mary Josephine)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time. Having considered Plaintiff LBH Engineers, LLC's Consent Motion to Extend Time for the Parties to Hold Rule 26(f) Conference, File Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, and Serve Initial Disclosures, arguments by the parties, and other relevant matters of records, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, for good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED. The deadline for the parties to hold their Rule 26(f) conference pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 is extended to December 18, 2019, and the deadline for the parties to file the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, and to make initial disclosures, is extended to January 2, 2020. No other deadlines in the case are extended. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/14/2019. (tmf)
November 14, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal J. Sweeney on behalf of Parsons Corporation, Parsons Transportation Group Inc. (Sweeney, Neal)
November 13, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by James Robert Artzer on behalf of Parsons Corporation, Parsons Transportation Group Inc. (Artzer, James)
November 13, 2019 Filing 37 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Hold Rule 26(f) Conference, File Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, and Serve Initial Disclosures with Brief In Support by LBH Engineers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
November 12, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by LBH Engineers, LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
November 12, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(1) filed by LBH Engineers, LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: The time for Defendants Archer Western Contractors, LLC, Archer Western Construction, LLC, Hubbard Construction Company, Northwest Express Roadbuilders, Parsons Corporation, Parsons Transportation Group Inc., and Heath & Lineback Engineers, Inc. to file their respective responses to the Complaint at issue is extended as follows: 1) Time to respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint [Doc. #1 ] is extended to December 2, 2019; and No other deadlines in the case are extended. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/1/2019. (tmf)
October 31, 2019 Filing 33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, with Brief In Support by LBH Engineers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Heard, Preston)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #22 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher C. Granaghan. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/30/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rvb)
October 29, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #22 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher C. Granaghan Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Christopher George Granaghan added appearing on behalf of LBH Engineers, LLC (pmb)
October 28, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Stay Discovery with Brief In Support by Georgia Department of Transportation, State Road and Tollway Authority. (Volkert, Mary Josephine)
October 28, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(1) with Brief In Support by Georgia Department of Transportation, State Road and Tollway Authority. (Volkert, Mary Josephine)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Brian P. Herrmann. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/28/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rvb)
October 25, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #21 APPLICATION for Admission of Brian P. Herrmann Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Brian P. Herrmann added appearing on behalf of LBH Engineers, LLC (pmb)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to John Murphy ; granting #20 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Edward R. Nelson. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/25/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rvb)
October 24, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #20 APPLICATION for Admission of Edward R. Nelson Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Edward R. Nelson, III added appearing on behalf of LBH Engineers, LLC (pmb)
October 24, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #19 APPLICATION for Admission of John Murphy Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney John Murphy added appearing on behalf of LBH Engineers, LLC (pmb)
October 24, 2019 Filing 30 Return of Service Executed by LBH Engineers, LLC. State Road and Tollway Authority served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. (Heard, Preston)
October 24, 2019 Filing 29 Return of Service Executed by LBH Engineers, LLC. Parsons Transportation Group Inc. served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. (Heard, Preston)
October 24, 2019 Filing 28 Return of Service Executed by LBH Engineers, LLC. Northwest Express Roadbuilders served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. (Heard, Preston)
October 24, 2019 Filing 27 Return of Service Executed by LBH Engineers, LLC. Hubbard Construction Company served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Heard, Preston)
October 24, 2019 Filing 26 Return of Service Executed by LBH Engineers, LLC. Heath & Lineback Engineers, Inc. served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Heard, Preston)
October 24, 2019 Filing 25 Return of Service Executed by LBH Engineers, LLC. Georgia Department of Transportation served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. (Heard, Preston)
October 24, 2019 Filing 24 Return of Service Executed by LBH Engineers, LLC. Archer Western Contractors, LLC served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. (Heard, Preston)
October 24, 2019 Filing 23 Return of Service Executed by LBH Engineers, LLC. Archer Western Construction, LLC served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. (Heard, Preston)
October 23, 2019 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher C. Granaghan Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by LBH Engineers, LLC. (Heard, Preston)
October 21, 2019 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Admission of Brian P. Herrmann Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by LBH Engineers, LLC. (Heard, Preston)
October 18, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Admission of Edward R. Nelson Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by LBH Engineers, LLC. (Heard, Preston)
October 18, 2019 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission of John Murphy Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by LBH Engineers, LLC. (Heard, Preston)
October 17, 2019 RETURN of #18 APPLICATION for Admission of John Murphy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9006576). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: courts. (pmb)
October 17, 2019 RETURN of #17 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher C. Granaghan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9006544). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: courts. (pmb)
October 17, 2019 RETURN of #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Brian P. Herrmann Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9006504). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: courts. (pmb)
October 17, 2019 RETURN of #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Edward R. Nelson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9005739). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: courts. (pmb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of John Murphy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9006576). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by LBH Engineers, LLC. (Heard, Preston)
October 15, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher C. Granaghan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9006544). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by LBH Engineers, LLC. (Heard, Preston)
October 15, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Brian P. Herrmann Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9006504). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by LBH Engineers, LLC. (Heard, Preston)
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Edward R. Nelson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9005739). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by LBH Engineers, LLC. (Heard, Preston)
October 10, 2019 Clerks Notation re #13 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/9/2019. (tmf)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Persons by LBH Engineers, LLC. (eop)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 Electronic Summons Issued as to Northwest Express Roadbuilders (Corporation Service Company). (eop)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 Electronic Summons Issued as to Northwest Express Roadbuilders (c/o Katherine Barton). (eop) Modified text on 10/8/2019 (eop).
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to State Road and Tollway Authority. (eop)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Georgia Department of Transportation. (eop)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Heath & Lineback Engineers, Inc.. (eop)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Parsons Transportation Group Inc.. (eop)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Parsons Corporation. (eop)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Hubbard Construction Company. (eop)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Archer Western Construction, LLC. (eop)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Archer Western Contractors, LLC. (eop)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by LBH Engineers, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8984437) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -US 8,578,537, #2 Exhibit -B -Partial Precast Inverted T Cap Presentation, #3 Exhibit -C -Aspire Article -re Northwest Corridor, #4 Exhibit -D -2019 PCI Design Awards, #5 Exhibit -E -Claim Chart, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LBH Engineers, LLC v. Archer Western Contractors, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archer Western Construction, LLC
Represented By: Wesley Cameron Achey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parsons Corporation
Represented By: James Robert Artzer
Represented By: Neal J. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Express Roadbuilders
Represented By: Wesley Cameron Achey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Head
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Department of Transportation
Represented By: Mary Josephine Leddy Volkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubbard Construction Company
Represented By: Wesley Cameron Achey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parsons Transportation Group Inc.
Represented By: James Robert Artzer
Represented By: Neal J. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archer Western Contractors, LLC
Represented By: Wesley Cameron Achey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Road and Tollway Authority
Represented By: Mary Josephine Leddy Volkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath & Lineback Engineers, Inc.
Represented By: Tawny D. Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LBH Engineers, LLC
Represented By: Edward R. Nelson, III
Represented By: Christopher George Granaghan
Represented By: Preston Hamilton Heard
Represented By: Brian P. Herrmann
Represented By: John Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?