Dukuray v. Cuccinelli et al
Plaintiff: Mahamadou Dukuray
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli and Kevin Riddle
Case Number: 1:2019cv04498
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR NOTICE REGARDING FLSA CASES Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/21/2019. (tmf) Modified on 11/25/2019 (jpa).
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/21/2019. (tmf) Modified on 11/25/2019 (jpa).
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Standing Order by Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin Riddle.(Cooper, Lisa)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Compliance Fogle, H. Glenn, Certificate of Compliance (Fogle, H.)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. All counsel of record and pro se parties are required to sign and file, within 10 days after entry of this Order, a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/2/19. (jpa)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Mahamadou Dukuray. All Defendants. (Fogle, H.)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kenneth Cuccinelli, Kevin Riddle, US Attorney, Attorney Genenral. (Attachments: #1 Summons Byung J. Pak, #2 Summons Kevin Riddle, #3 Summons Ken Cuccinelli)(tmf)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mahamadou Dukuray. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8988010) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dukuray v. Cuccinelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahamadou Dukuray
Represented By: H. Glenn Fogle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?