Rangel v. Forfeiture Counsel, Asset Forfeiture Section
Plaintiff: Juan Gabriel Rangel
Defendant: Forfeiture Counsel, Asset Forfeiture Section
Case Number: 1:2019cv04559
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Referring Judge: Russell G Vineyard
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Submission of #3 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (rlb)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Juan Gabriel Rangel. (rlb)
October 23, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Juan Gabriel Rangel re #2 Order. (rlb)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Plaintiff must, within THIRTY (30) DAYS of the date of the entry date of this order, either submit the full filing and administrative fee of $400.00, or execute and return a financial affidavit seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to forward the appropriate financial affidavit to plaintiff, together with a copy of this Order. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to resubmit this action to the assigned Magistrate Judge upon receipt of the full filing and administrative fee or affidavit or at the expiration of the time period noted above. Forms sent to party: One (1) Affidavit and Authorization. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 10/22/19. (rlb)
October 17, 2019 Submission of #1 Complaint for Mandamus Relief to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard for IFP determination. (bnp)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief Notice of Appeal filed by Juan Gabriel Rangel. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeals, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rangel v. Forfeiture Counsel, Asset Forfeiture Section
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Gabriel Rangel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forfeiture Counsel, Asset Forfeiture Section
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?