Stanley v. Mohawk Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Beth Stanley
Defendant: Mohawk Industries, Inc. and IVC US, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04621
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Beth Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint)(Roberts, Victor)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #9 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/6/19. (jpa)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by IVC US, Inc.. (Monroe, John)
November 18, 2019 Clerks Notation re #8 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by IVC US, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mohawk Industries, Inc. for IVC US, Inc.. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
November 15, 2019 Clerks Notation re: #8 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 11/19/2019. (cmb)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by IVC US, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mohawk Industries, Inc. for IVC US, Inc.. (Monroe, John)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by IVC US, Inc.. Discovery ends on 4/13/2020.(Monroe, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Beth Stanley. IVC US, Inc. served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Roberts, Victor)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Beth Stanley. Mohawk Industries, Inc. served on 11/4/2019. (Roberts, Victor)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to IVC US, Inc. (jpa)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against IVC US, Inc.with Jury Demand filed by Beth Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Roberts, Victor) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Mohawk Industries, Inc. (jed)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Beth Stanley. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC- 9003692) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used- forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanley v. Mohawk Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Stanley
Represented By: Victor Severin Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohawk Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IVC US, Inc.
Represented By: John Lauchlin Monroe, Jr.
Represented By: Courtney Elizabeth Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?