Herring v. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Kimberly N. Herring
Defendant: PNC Bank, National Association, Inc., PNC Mortgage and PennyMac Loan Services, LLC,
Case Number: 1:2019cv04691
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J Clay Fuller
Referring Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Lewis Erkenbrack on behalf of Kimberly N. Herring (Erkenbrack, Joseph)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PennyMac Loan Services, LLC,with Jury Demand filed by Kimberly N. Herring.(clk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/12/2019. (clk)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Kimberly N. Herring. (Sieg, Paul)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kimberly N. Herring. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9017084) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herring v. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, National Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly N. Herring
Represented By: Adam Klein
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Sieg
Represented By: Joseph Lewis Erkenbrack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?