Pace et al v. Low et al
Plaintiff: Gilbert Young, Artistry of Bill Traylor, Bill Traylor Family Trust and Cheree Newson Pace
Defendant: Thomas Low and Phillip Lee
Case Number: 1:2019cv04713
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Gilbert Young re #3 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (dob)
November 6, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cheree Newson Pace re #3 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (dob)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER denying #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 11/5/2019. (dob)
October 22, 2019 Submission of #2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (dob)
October 22, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (dob)
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cheree Newson Pace. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob)
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gilbert Young. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pace et al v. Low et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artistry of Bill Traylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Traylor Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheree Newson Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Low
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?