Cham et al v. Turner
Plaintiff: Alisab Investments and Haddy Cham
Defendant: Yolanda Turner
Case Number: 1:2019cv04824
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Alisab Investments, Haddy Cham, Yolanda Turner re #5 Order. (jpa)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. All counsel of record and pro se parties are required to sign and file, within 10 days after entry of this Order, a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/2/19. (jpa)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Yolanda Turner re #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Mail stamped "Postage.50." (tcc)
October 30, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Alisab Investments, Haddy Cham, Yolanda Turner re #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (tcc)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 10/30/2019. (tcc)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order (Contained w/in #3 Final R & R) ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis, for the purposes of remand only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 10/30/2019. (tcc)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County. This is a Final Report and Recommendation, there is nothing further pending in this action, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral of this matter to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 10/30/2019. (tcc)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Yolanda Turner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 28, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (eop)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Yolanda Turner. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cham et al v. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisab Investments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haddy Cham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?