Universal Music-MGB NA, LLC et al v. Amuri Entertainment Group, L.l.C. et al
Plaintiff: Universal Music-MGB NA, LLC, Uncle Buddie's Music, Inc., Uncle Ronnie's Music Company, Inc. and Notting Dale Songs, Inc.
Defendant: Evelyn St. James, Ronald St. James, Tiffany Flax and Amuri Entertainment Group, L.l.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04838
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Strike #12 Answer to Complaint, with Brief In Support by Notting Dale Songs, Inc., Uncle Buddie's Music, Inc., Uncle Ronnie's Music Company, Inc., Universal Music-MGB NA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Spital, Jonathan)
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 Instructions to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 12/13/19. (rsh)
December 11, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Amuri Entertainment Group, L.l.C., Tiffany Flax, Evelyn St. James, Ronald St. James. Discovery ends on 5/11/2020.(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Uncle Buddie's Music, Inc., Uncle Ronnie's Music Company, Inc., Notting Dale Songs, Inc., Universal Music-MGB NA, LLC. Ronald St. James served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Spital, Jonathan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Uncle Buddie's Music, Inc., Uncle Ronnie's Music Company, Inc., Notting Dale Songs, Inc., Universal Music-MGB NA, LLC. Evelyn St. James served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Spital, Jonathan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Uncle Buddie's Music, Inc., Uncle Ronnie's Music Company, Inc., Notting Dale Songs, Inc., Universal Music-MGB NA, LLC. Amuri Entertainment Group, L.l.C. served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Spital, Jonathan)
November 8, 2019 Refund in the amount of $400.00 has been processed, effective 11/8/2019 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
November 4, 2019 Clerks Approval re #8 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-9037105. (Spital, Jonathan)
October 30, 2019 Clerks Notation re #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED AO 121 . (Spital, Jonathan)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Notting Dale Songs, Inc., Uncle Buddie's Music, Inc., Uncle Ronnie's Music Company, Inc., Universal Music-MGB NA, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Universal Music Group, Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Universal Music-MGB NA, LLC by Notting Dale Songs, Inc., Uncle Buddie's Music, Inc., Uncle Ronnie's Music Company, Inc., Universal Music-MGB NA, LLC.(Spital, Jonathan)
October 29, 2019 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ronald St. James. (eop)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Evelyn St. James. (eop)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Tiffany Flax. (eop)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Amuri Entertainment Group, L.l.C.. (eop)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Uncle Buddie's Music, Inc., Uncle Ronnie's Music Company, Inc., Notting Dale Songs, Inc. and Universal Music-MGB NA, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9037105) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Schedule A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal Music-MGB NA, LLC et al v. Amuri Entertainment Group, L.l.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn St. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald St. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Flax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amuri Entertainment Group, L.l.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music-MGB NA, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Spital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uncle Buddie's Music, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Spital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uncle Ronnie's Music Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Spital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Notting Dale Songs, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Spital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?