Rodney v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Plaintiff: Stephen Rodney
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04850
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Referring Judge: Janet F King
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Submission of #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to Magistrate Judge Janet F. King. (ddm)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A -- Security Deed, #3 Exhibit B -- Assignment (First), #4 Exhibit C -- Assignment (Second), #5 Exhibit D -- Deed Under Power)(Kearns, John)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Notation re #6 Certificate of Interested Persons. READ and APPROVED by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King. (kt)
November 5, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Shannin Render re #7 Order. (ddm)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time, through November 26, 2019, for Defendant to respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 11/5/19. (ddm)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (Kearns, John)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kearns, John)
October 31, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #2 Order. Clerk's error. #2 Standing Order was filed in error. (bnw)
October 31, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Shannin Render re #4 Notice to Pro Se Parties. (ddm)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro Se Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 10/31/19. (ddm)
October 30, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Shannin Render, counsel for Stephen Rodney re #3 Order. (ddm)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Request for a Temporary Restraining Order. As Plaintiff's Complaint concerns an allegedly wrongful residential real property foreclosure, this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Janet F. King for all future pretrial matters. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/30/19. (ddm)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILED IN ERROR STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/29/19. (bnw) Modified on 10/31/2019 to edit text (bnw).
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Temporary Restraining Order, filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9039830) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibits B - Security Deed, #3 Exhibit C - Tax Information, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodney v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Campbell
Represented By: John Michael Kearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Rodney
Represented By: Shannin Render
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?