Carter v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tawana L. Carter
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association,
Case Number: 1:2019cv04863
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to file a Response in Opposition to the #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, Notice of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Tawana L. Carter. (aaq)
December 12, 2019 Clerk updated party defendant Well Fargo as directed re #14 Order. (jta)
December 12, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Tawana L. Carter re #14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time. (jta)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or file an Amended Complaint through December 24, 2019. Defendants state that the latter defendant has been incorrectly identified in the pleadings. See Mot. to Dismiss #10 at 1 n.1. The Clerk is DIRECTED to update the docket to reflect the names in this caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 12/10/19. (jta)
December 11, 2019 Submission of #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re: #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (dob)
November 26, 2019 Submission of #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (dob)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Tawana L. Carter. (bjh)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re: #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, by Tawana L. Carter. (bjh)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED Certificate of Service by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Chaness, Bret) Modified on 11/13/2019 to edit event selected and text to reflect PDF (dob).
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit "A", #3 Exhibit "B", #4 Exhibit "C", #5 Exhibit "D", #6 Exhibit "E", #7 Exhibit "F", #8 Exhibit "G")(Chaness, Bret)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark H. Cohen: Motion Hearing held on 11/4/2019 re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Tawana L. Carter. There was no appearance by the plaintiff. (Court Reporter Judith Wolff)(dob)
November 4, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Tawana L. Carter re Case Referred to Magistrate Judge, #8 Order on Motion for TRO. (adg)
November 4, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (adg)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING #5 Plaintiff's Motion for TRO. The Clerk is directed to refer this action to the next available Magistrate Judge pursuant to Standing Order 18-01 and standard assignment procedures. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on November 4, 2019. (lwb)
October 31, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Tawana L. Carter re #3 Order. (dob)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits for Response)(Chaness, Bret)
October 30, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Tawana L. Carter re #6 Order Setting Hearing on Motion. (dob)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2019 at 02:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1905 before Judge Mark H. Cohen. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/30/2019. (dob)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/30/2019. (dob)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Notice of Supplemental Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Chaness, Bret)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (contained in Complaint) by Tawana L. Carter. (jdb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2019: #1 Corrected Document) (jdb).
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT by Tawana L. Carter.(jdb)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT, filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9040970). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawana L. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Corey Tova Rothschild
Represented By: Bret Jacob Chaness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Corey Tova Rothschild
Represented By: Bret Jacob Chaness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association,
Represented By: Corey Tova Rothschild
Represented By: Bret Jacob Chaness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?