Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Longshore et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Darius Williams, No Days Off Radio, LLC and Jace Longshore
Case Number: 1:2019cv04905
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Darius Williams served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Wehunt, J. Marshall)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Jace Longshore served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Wehunt, J. Marshall)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint , as to No Days off Radio LLC d/b/a DA Warehouse., Return of Service Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. No Days Off Radio, LLC served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Wehunt, J. Marshall)
November 4, 2019 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Person/Corporate Disclosures of Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
November 4, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to the Register of Copyrights re #5 A.O. Form 121 Copyright. (ah)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (ah)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Disclosures by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.(ah)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (ah)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jace Longshore, Darius Williams and No Days Off Radio, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Darius Williams, #2 Summons No Days Off Radio LLC)(ah)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9046040). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Longshore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darius Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: No Days Off Radio, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jace Longshore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: J. Marshall "Buzz&quot Wehunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?