Woodcrest Village et al v. Harvill
Plaintiff: Woodcrest Village and RAM Partners, LLC
Defendant: Deangela Harvill
Case Number: 1:2019cv04948
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 Case has been electronically remanded to Magistrate Court of DeKalb County, Georgia. (rjs)
December 3, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (rjs)
December 3, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Deangela Harvill, RAM Partners, LLC, Woodcrest Village re #7 Order. (rjs)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER adopting #3 Final Report and Recommendation as the Order of this Court. This case is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County, Georgia for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/3/2019. (rjs)
December 2, 2019 Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 Mail sent to RAM Partners, LLC re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Returned as Undeliverable. (rjs)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 Mail sent to Woodcrest Village re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Returned as Undeliverable. (rjs)
November 7, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Deangela Harvill, RAM Partners, LLC, Woodcrest Village re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (rjs)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/7/2019. (rjs)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (found in #3 R&R) granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/7/2019. (rjs)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal: The undersigned RECOMMENDS that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference of this case to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/7/2019. (rjs)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Deangela Harvill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 5, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (eop)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Deangela Harvill. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodcrest Village et al v. Harvill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woodcrest Village
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAM Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deangela Harvill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?