S.P.S., ex rel, et al v. Raffensperger et al
Plaintiff: S.P.S., ex rel., Edwin Prior, DSCC, Priorities USA, DNC Services Corp., DCCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., Natalie Short, Aileen Nakamura and Angie Jones
Defendant: Anh Le, Brad Raffensperger, David Worley, Rebecca Sullivan and Seth Harp
Case Number: 1:2019cv04960
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Seth Harp, Anh Le, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dec. of Michael Fronterra, #2 Exhibit B - Order Denying Preliminary Injunction in Jacobson)(Tyson, Bryan)
December 20, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Tyson, Bryan)
December 20, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of Seth Harp, Anh Le, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley (Tyson, Bryan)
December 4, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Newkirk, Zachary)
December 4, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (McGowan, Charlene)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #25 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 12/4/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
December 4, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #25 APPLICATION for Admission of Zachary J. Newkirk Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Zachary J. Newkirk added appearing on behalf of DCCC, DNC Services Corp., DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., Angie Jones, Aileen Nakamura, Edwin Prior, Priorities USA, S.P.S., ex rel., Natalie Short (pmb)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING #28 Motion for Extension of Time through 12/20/2019 for defendants to respond to #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff shall file a reply on or before 1/10/2020. The Clerk is directed to submit the motion to the Court on 1/13/2020. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/27/2019. (adg)
November 26, 2019 Filing 28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Briefing Deadlines regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by DCCC, DNC Services Corp., DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., Angie Jones, Aileen Nakamura, Edwin Prior, Priorities USA, S.P.S., ex rel., Natalie Short. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sparks, Adam)
November 26, 2019 Submission of #28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Briefing Deadlines regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
November 25, 2019 Submission of #27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #17 Amended Complaint to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #17 Amended Complaint. All Defendants answer due January 10, 2020. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/25/19. (hfm)
November 22, 2019 Filing 27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #17 Amended Complaint,, with Brief In Support by Seth Harp, Anh Le, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley. (McGowan, Charlene)
November 22, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlene R. Marino on behalf of Seth Harp, Anh Le, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley (Marino, Charlene)
November 22, 2019 Filing 25 APPLICATION for Admission of Zachary J. Newkirk Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by DCCC, DNC Services Corp., DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., Angie Jones, Aileen Nakamura, Edwin Prior, Priorities USA, S.P.S., ex rel., Natalie Short. (Sparks, Adam)
November 19, 2019 RETURN of #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Zachary J. Newkirk Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: courts. (pmb)
November 19, 2019 Submission of #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
November 18, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #23 Response in Support of Motion. Docket text modified to reflect filing as Brief in Support re #22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (hfm)
November 18, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits in Support of Motion re #22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by DCCC, DNC Services Corp., DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., Angie Jones, Aileen Nakamura, Edwin Prior, Priorities USA, S.P.S., ex rel., Natalie Short re #23 Response in Support of Motion, #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elisabeth C. Frost, #2 Exhibit A - Rodden Report, #3 Exhibit B - Krosnick Report, #4 Exhibit C - Fraga Report, #5 Exhibit D - DPG Declaration, #6 Exhibit E - DSCC Declaration, #7 Exhibit F - DCCC Declaration, #8 Exhibit G - DPG Declaration, #9 Exhibit H - SPS Declaration, #10 Exhibit I - E. Prior Declaration, #11 Exhibit J - A. Jones Declaration, #12 Exhibit K - A. Nakamura - Declaration, #13 Exhibit L - Dominion Cert., #14 Exhibit M - EAC)(Sparks, Adam) Modified on 11/19/2019 to edit text (bnp).
November 18, 2019 Filing 23 BRIEF in Support re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Memorandum in Support filed by DCCC, DNC Services Corp., DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., Angie Jones, Aileen Nakamura, Edwin Prior, Priorities USA, S.P.S., ex rel., Natalie Short. (Sparks, Adam) Modified on 11/19/2019 (hfm).
November 18, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by DCCC, DNC Services Corp., DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., Angie Jones, Aileen Nakamura, Edwin Prior, Priorities USA, S.P.S., ex rel., Natalie Short. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sparks, Adam)
November 18, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #13 Order, (Khanna, Abha)
November 15, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Knapp, Halsey)
November 15, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Sparks, Adam)
November 15, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #13 Order, (Elias, Marc)
November 15, 2019 Filing 17 First AMENDED COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants filed by Natalie Short, Priorities USA, Edwin Prior, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., DCCC, DNC Services Corp., S.P.S., ex rel., DSCC, Aileen Nakamura, Angie Jones.(Sparks, Adam) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 11/18/2019 to add filers (bnp).
November 14, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #13 Order, (Frost, Elisabeth)
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #13 Order, (Anderson, Jacki)
November 13, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Zachary J. Newkirk Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by DCCC, DNC Services Corp., DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., Edwin Prior, Priorities USA, S.P.S., ex rel., Natalie Short. (Sparks, Adam)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/12/19. (bnp)
November 12, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Jacki Lynn Anderson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9058977). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Jacki Lynn Anderson added appearing on behalf of DCCC, DNC Services Corp., DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., Edwin Prior, Priorities USA, S.P.S., ex rel., Natalie Short (pmb)
November 12, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Marc Erik Elias Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9058973). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Marc E. Elias added appearing on behalf of DCCC, DNC Services Corp., DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., Edwin Prior, Priorities USA, S.P.S., ex rel., Natalie Short (pmb)
November 12, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Abha Khanna Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9058978). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Abha Khanna added appearing on behalf of DCCC, DNC Services Corp., DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., Edwin Prior, Priorities USA, S.P.S., ex rel., Natalie Short (pmb)
November 12, 2019 RETURN of #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Zachary J. Newkirk Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9058976). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: courts. (pmb)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #7 , #9 , #10 , and #11 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/12/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
November 12, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Elisabeth Carmel Frost Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9058999). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Elisabeth Carmel Frost added appearing on behalf of DCCC, DNC Services Corp., DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., Edwin Prior, Priorities USA, S.P.S., ex rel., Natalie Short (pmb)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons by DCCC, DNC Services Corp., DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., Edwin Prior, Priorities USA, S.P.S., ex rel., Natalie Short. (Sparks, Adam)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Elisabeth Carmel Frost Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9058999). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by DCCC, DNC Services Corp., DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., Edwin Prior, Priorities USA, S.P.S., ex rel., Natalie Short. (Sparks, Adam)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Abha Khanna Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9058978). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by DCCC, DNC Services Corp., DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., Edwin Prior, Priorities USA, S.P.S., ex rel., Natalie Short. (Sparks, Adam)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Jacki Lynn Anderson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9058977). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by DCCC, DNC Services Corp., DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., Edwin Prior, Priorities USA, S.P.S., ex rel., Natalie Short. (Sparks, Adam)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Zachary J. Newkirk Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9058976). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by DCCC, DNC Services Corp., DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., Edwin Prior, Priorities USA, S.P.S., ex rel., Natalie Short. (Sparks, Adam)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Marc Erik Elias Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9058973). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by DCCC, DNC Services Corp., DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., Edwin Prior, Priorities USA, S.P.S., ex rel., Natalie Short. (Sparks, Adam)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Anh Le. (eop)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Seth Harp. (eop)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to David Worley. (eop)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Rebecca Sullivan. (eop)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brad Raffensperger. (eop)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by S.P.S., ex rel., Natalie Short, Priorities USA, Edwin Prior, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., DCCC, DNC Services Corp. and DSCC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9051149) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.P.S., ex rel, et al v. Raffensperger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.P.S., ex rel.
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Jacki Lynn Anderson
Represented By: Zachary J. Newkirk
Represented By: Elisabeth Carmel Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Prior
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Jacki Lynn Anderson
Represented By: Zachary J. Newkirk
Represented By: Elisabeth Carmel Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DSCC
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Jacki Lynn Anderson
Represented By: Zachary J. Newkirk
Represented By: Elisabeth Carmel Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priorities USA
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Jacki Lynn Anderson
Represented By: Zachary J. Newkirk
Represented By: Elisabeth Carmel Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DNC Services Corp.
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Jacki Lynn Anderson
Represented By: Zachary J. Newkirk
Represented By: Elisabeth Carmel Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DCCC
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Jacki Lynn Anderson
Represented By: Zachary J. Newkirk
Represented By: Elisabeth Carmel Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Jacki Lynn Anderson
Represented By: Zachary J. Newkirk
Represented By: Elisabeth Carmel Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Short
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Jacki Lynn Anderson
Represented By: Zachary J. Newkirk
Represented By: Elisabeth Carmel Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aileen Nakamura
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Jacki Lynn Anderson
Represented By: Zachary J. Newkirk
Represented By: Elisabeth Carmel Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angie Jones
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Jacki Lynn Anderson
Represented By: Zachary J. Newkirk
Represented By: Elisabeth Carmel Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anh Le
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Worley
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Sullivan
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Harp
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?