Green Implementation Group LLC v King
Plaintiff: Green Implementation Group LLC and Erica King
Case Number: 1:2019cv04963
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Erica King re #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, #6 Letter. (tcc)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 Certified copy of #5 Order e-filed with the Clerk of Court, Magistrate Court of Dekalb County. (tcc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2019: #1 Receipt) (tcc).
December 2, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (tcc)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - After carefully considering the #3 Final Report and Recommendation of the magistrate judge and finding no error, the court receives the report and recommendation with approval and adopts it as the opinion and order of this court, and this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County. As noted in the R&R, Erica King filed a complaint in which she lists herself as the defendant and Green Implementation Group, LLC as the plaintiff. However, it is evident that King intended to file a notice of a removal of the dispossessory action from Magistrate Court of DeKalb County that was filed against her by Green Implementation Group, LLC. Therefore, the clerk is DIRECTED to modify the docket to reflect that King is the defendant, Green Implementation Group, LLC is the plaintiff, and the filing entered on November 12, 2019 [Doc. No. #2 ] is a Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 12/2/2019. (tcc)
November 12, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Erica King re #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (tcc)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 11/12/2019. (tcc)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order (Contained w/in #3 Final R&R) ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis, for the purposes of remand only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 11/12/2019. (tcc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County. This is a Final Report and Recommendation, there is nothing further pending in this case, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference of this matter to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 11/12/2019. (tcc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Complaint PDF attached construed by Judge Pannell as a Notice of Removal within the #5 Order) with COMPLAINT filed by Erica King. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 12/3/2019 (tcc). Modified on 12/27/2019 to edit text. (aaq).
November 6, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (eop)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Erica King. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Implementation Group LLC v King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Implementation Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?