Dees v. Unknown
Appellee: Unknown
Appellant: Claire Dees
Case Number: 1:2019cv04978
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
November 22, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Claire Dees re #4 Order, #5 Clerk's Judgment. (ddm)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing action. (ddm)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER dismissing this action under Local Rule 41.3(A)(2). Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 11/22/19. (ddm)
November 21, 2019 Submission of #2 Order, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ddm)
November 8, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Claire Dees re #3 Order. (ddm)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation for cases proceeding before the Honorable J.P. Boulee. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 11/8/19. (ddm)
November 6, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Claire Dees re #2 Order, IFP Application. (ddm)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing that Appellant pay the required appeal filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis before November 20, 2019. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 11/6/19. (ddm)
November 5, 2019 Submission of #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal to District Judge J. P. Boulee for an IFP review. (ah)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal filed by Claire Dees, USBC Case#: 19-66217-pwb. Notice of Appeal filed 10/04/2019 from Order entered 09/18/2019 by Appellant Claire Dees. Fee Paid: NO. (Attachments: #1 NOA doc119, #2 doc116, #3 doc120, #4 doc122, #5 docket sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dees v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Claire Dees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?