Infinity Hidden Cove, LLC v. Green
Plaintiff: Infinity Hidden Cove, LLC
Defendant: Brandon Green
Case Number: 1:2019cv04987
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Orinda D Evans
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Brandon Green, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (bdb)
November 12, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Brandon Green re #3 Final Report and Recommendation and #4 Order for Service of Final Report and Recommendation. (sap)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Final Report and Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Final Report and Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 11/12/2019. (sap)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 11/12/2019. (sap)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Brandon Green. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 11/12/2019 in the #3 Final Report and Recommendation. (sap)
November 7, 2019 Submission of Notice of Removal for Review; re: #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (eop)
November 7, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (eop)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Brandon Green. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Infinity Hidden Cove, LLC v. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Infinity Hidden Cove, LLC
Represented By: Russell Isaac Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?