HRN Group, LLC v. Wilmington Savings Fund
Appellant: HRN Group, LLC
Appellee: Wilmington Savings Fund
Case Number: 1:2019cv05011
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Compliance by HRN Group, LLC. (jed)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED - Designated items not filed (Attachments: #1 Statement of Issues doc111)(Lugo, Yahaira)
November 21, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to HRN Group, LLC re #2 Order. (jpa)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER All counsel of record and pro se parties are required to sign and file, within 10 days after entry of this Order, a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/2/19. (jpa)
November 18, 2019 Filing Fee Paid: $ 298, receipt number 1259582 (adg)
November 6, 2019 Submission of #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg for IFP review. (ah)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal filed by HRN Group, LLC, USBC Case#: 18-63282-wlh. Notice of Appeal filed 11/04/2019 from Order entered 10/23/2019 by Appellant HRN Group, LLC. Fee Paid: NO. (Attachments: #1 NOA doc100, #2 Order doc92, #3 Docket Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HRN Group, LLC v. Wilmington Savings Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: HRN Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wilmington Savings Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?