Elite Property Management Services, LLC v. Farley
Plaintiff: Elite Property Management Services, LLC
Defendant: Tambra Farley
Case Number: 1:2019cv05012
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Tambra Farley re #12 Order. (jpa)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING #10 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 1/2/20. (jpa)
December 23, 2019 Submission of #10 MOTION to Reopen Case, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (tcc)
December 18, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Re-Mailing as to Tambra Farley re #7 Order. Mailed to updated address re #9 Notice. (bnp)
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 Mail sent to Tambra Farley re #7 Order returned as undeliverable. Marked: RTS; Insufficient Address; Unable to Forward. (bnp)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Reopen Case by Tambra Farley. (jpa)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address for Tambra Farley (jpa)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 Receipt of ELECTRONIC filing of the #7 Order with the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. (jpa)
December 4, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Tambra Farley re #7 Order (jpa)
December 3, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (jpa)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING the #3 Final Report and Recommendation. The Court REMANDS this action to the Magistrate Court Of Fulton County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/3/19. (jpa)
December 2, 2019 Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpa)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Tambra Farley re #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (jpa)
November 13, 2019 NEF regenerated for #2 Notice of Removal. (aaq)
November 13, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Tambra Farley as to Tambra Farley regarding #5 Order. (mlb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
November 13, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Tambra Farley re #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation and #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (jed)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 11/13/2019. (jed)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 11/13/2019 in #3 R&R. (jed)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal. The undersigned RECOMMENDS that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. This is a Final Report and Recommendation, there is nothing further pending in this case, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference of this matter to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 11/13/2019. (jed)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Tambra Farley. (jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used- forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2019: #1 Corrected Main Document, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jed).
November 8, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (eop)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Tambra Farley. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elite Property Management Services, LLC v. Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tambra Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elite Property Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Fred Joseph Rushing, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?