Herndon v. Warren et al
Plaintiff: James Herndon
Defendant: Sheriff Buddy Neil Warren, Deputy Glenn Daniel and Lieutenant Colonel Robert Quigley
Case Number: 1:2019cv05039
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (bnp)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: On December 12, 2019, the parties in this action notified the Court by telephone that a settlement agreement has been reached. As no matters remain pending before this court, the Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this action. The parties are directed to file a stipulation of dismissal by January 15, 2020. In the event that the settlement is not consummated by that time, the Parties may move to reopen this action. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 12/12/19. (bnp)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James Herndon. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Waivers of Service)(Goodmark, Craig)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time, through and including December 12, 2019, to respond re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . By Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/27/19. (hfm)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Glenn Daniel, Robert Quigley, Buddy Neil Warren. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Choy, Sun)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): December 13-27, by Gerald R. Weber. (Weber, Gerald)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by James Herndon indicating service of the Complaint, and Motion for Preliminary Injunction (with all exhibits) and brief in support upon Defendants by the most expeditious means reasonably practicable as per the Court's November 7, 2019 order (Goodmark, Craig)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff is DIRECTED to serve the Summons, Complaint, and #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (with all exhibits) upon Defendants by the most expeditious means reasonably practicable, including electronically, and file a certificate of such service, NO LATER THAN Thursday, November 14, 2019. Plaintiff is FURTHER DIRECTED to arrange for personal service of Defendants under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4 (which may include securing a waiver of such service pursuant to Rule 4(d)) by NO LATER THAN Friday, December 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/7/19. (bnp)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/6/19. (jpa)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by James Herndon. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Goodmark, Craig)
November 6, 2019 Submission of #1 Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Damages to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages with Jury Demand filed by James Herndon. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9061654) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A through I, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herndon v. Warren et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Herndon
Represented By: Gerald R. Weber
Represented By: Jennifer Beth Hickey
Represented By: Craig Lewis Goodmark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Buddy Neil Warren
Represented By: Sun S. Choy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Glenn Daniel
Represented By: Sun S. Choy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Colonel Robert Quigley
Represented By: Sun S. Choy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?