McMillon v. Unknown
Appellant: Robin McMillon
Debtor: Robin Florence Jean McMillon
Appellee: Unknown
Case Number: 1:2019cv05115
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Robin McMillon re #3 Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule. (anc)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule to all parties. Appellants Brief due by 1/9/2020. (anc)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED - DESIGNATED ITEMS NOT FILED (Lugo, Yahaira)
November 22, 2019 Filing Fee Paid: $ 298, receipt number 1259658 (anc)
November 15, 2019 Submission of #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. for IFP review. (jap)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal filed by Appellant, Robin McMillon, USBC Case#: 19-63741-sms. Notice of Appeal filed 11/08/2019 from Order entered 10/16/2019. Fee Paid: NO. (Attachments: #1 NOA Doc. 33, #2 Order Doc. 23, #3 Docket Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMillon v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Robin McMillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Robin Florence Jean McMillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?