Van Horn v. TransAm, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dexter Van Horn
Defendant: TransAm Trucking, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05154
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Submission of #8 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpa)
December 23, 2019 Submission of #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court , to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (tcc)
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4(A) by TransAm Trucking, Inc..(O'Daniel, Clay)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Per the Parties' request, this case is assigned to a eight (8) month discovery period, commencing from on December 23, 2019, and expiring on August 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/18/19. (bnp)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 Initial Disclosures by Dexter Van Horn.(McIntosh, Brent)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4(A) by TransAm Trucking, Inc..(O'Daniel, Clay)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by TransAm Trucking, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Demand Letter, #2 Brief Amended Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(O'Daniel, Clay)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by TransAm Trucking, Inc.. (O'Daniel, Clay)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by TransAm Trucking, Inc.. (O'Daniel, Clay)
November 21, 2019 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by TransAm Trucking, Inc.. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by TransAm Trucking, Inc.. (O'Daniel, Clay)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by TransAm Trucking, Inc.. Discovery ends on 4/20/2020.(O'Daniel, Clay) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by Dexter Van Horn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Brent)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by TransAm Trucking, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-9089978) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Horn v. TransAm, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter Van Horn
Represented By: Brent McIntosh
Represented By: Summit Singh Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransAm Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Robert Johnson
Represented By: Clay Seaton O'Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?