GA Rental 2 LLC v. Edwards
Plaintiff: GA Rental 2 LLC
Defendant: Krystal Edwards
Case Number: 1:2019cv05232
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Case electronically filed in Dekalb County Magistrate Court re #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation and #6 Remand Letter (rlb)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 Remand Letter to Dekalb County Magistrate Court. (rlb)
January 7, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (rlb)
January 7, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Krystal Edwards, GA Rental 2 LLC re #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation,. (rlb)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER adopting #3 Final Report and Recommendation as the Opinion of this Court. IT IS ORDERED that this case is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/7/20. (rlb)
December 16, 2019 Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Krystal Edwards, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (rlb)
November 27, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Krystal Edwards, GA Rental 2 LLC re #4 Order for Service, #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal filed by Krystal Edwards. (bdb)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 11/27/2019. (bdb)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that the #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Krystal Edwards be REMANDED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County. Defendant's Application for Leave to Proceed informa pauperis is GRANTED. the Clerk is directed to terminate the reference to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 11/26/2019. (bdb)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Krystal Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 11/27/2019 in R&R. (bdb)
November 26, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (eop)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Krystal Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GA Rental 2 LLC v. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GA Rental 2 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krystal Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?