Stormborn Technologies LLC v. Blue Bird Inc.
Plaintiff: Stormborn Technologies LLC
Defendant: Blue Bird Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05330
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 RETURN of #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Howard Wernow Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: local counsel. (pmb)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. All counsel of record and pro se parties are required to sign and file, within 10 days after entry of this Order, a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/02/19. (smj)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Howard Wernow Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Burt, Jacqueline)
December 18, 2019 RETURN of #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Howard Wernow Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9168272). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: courts. (pmb)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Howard Wernow Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9168272). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Burt, Jacqueline)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (ah)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Blue Bird Inc. (ah)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stormborn Technologies LLC.(ah)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9119945). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stormborn Technologies LLC v. Blue Bird Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stormborn Technologies LLC
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Represented By: Jacqueline Knapp Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Bird Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?