Shealey v. PHH Mortgage
Plaintiff: Pamela W. Shealey
Defendant: PHH Mortgage
Case Number: 1:2019cv05368
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Orinda D Evans
Referring Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Pamela W. Shealey re #7 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #6 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (tcc)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Service of #6 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 1/21/2020. (tcc)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER - If Shealey wishes to prepare a more-carefully-drafted amended complaint for consideration by the Court, she is DIRECTED to submit it with her objections to this #6 Final Report and Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 1/21/2020. (tcc)
January 21, 2020 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that Shealey's complaint [Doc. #1 -1] be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 1/21/2020. (tcc)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that PHH's motion to dismiss [Doc. #2 ] be GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 1/21/2020. (tcc)
December 30, 2019 Submission of #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (bdb)
December 3, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Pamela W. Shealey re #5 Order. (bdb)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Stay Pretrial and Discovery Deadlines filed by Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation pending the Court's ruling on Defendant's #2 Motion to Dismiss. The pre-trial deadlines for all parties and the discovery period are stayed in this case until the Court enters an order ruling on Defendant's pending motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 12/3/2019. (bdb)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHH Mortgage identifying Other Affiliate Ocwen Financial Corporation for PHH Mortgage by PHH Mortgage.(Windham, Mark)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay Pretrial and Discovery Deadlines by PHH Mortgage. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Windham, Mark)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by PHH Mortgage. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Windham, Mark)
December 3, 2019 Submission of #1 Notice of Removal for Review, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (eop)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by PHH Mortgage. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-9128274) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Complaint, #2 Exhibit -B -Tax Assessment Info, #3 Exhibit -C - Notice of Filing, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shealey v. PHH Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage
Represented By: Mark James Windham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela W. Shealey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?