Miller v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Miller
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2019cv05525
Filed: December 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Brian Jackson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Jackson, G.)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 19 - (Amended Proposed Discovery, Scheduling, and Case Management Order. Initial Discovery Pool). Expert Discovery for the Trial Pool Cases shall be completed by 2/28/2020. By February 24, 2020, each side shall submit to the Court, outside of the ECF system, a memorandum in support of their proposed manner of trial, order of selection of plaintiffs for trial, and timing of trial(s). By March 2, 2020, the parties may submit a response to the opposing party's memorandum regarding the proposed manner of trial and order of cases for trial, and timing of trial(s). Dispositive or Daubert motions shall be filed in each of the Trial Cases by April 3, 2020. Responses shall be filed by April 22, 2020. Replies shall be filed by April 30, 2020. The Court will set the first trial for July 20, 2020. (For details, see order) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/16/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
December 8, 2019 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by James Miller (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9159634) (Direct File MDL from District of New Jersey). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: G. Brian Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: G. Brian Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Miller
Represented By: Jason C. Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?