Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. v. United States Department of Justice
Plaintiff: Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2019cv05567
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: For good cause shown, the #8 motion is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than February 14, 2020. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 1/16/20. (bnw)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief In Support by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Samuel)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service , as to U.S. Dept of Justice; Atty Gen. William P. Barr; U.S. Atty's Office for NDGA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Howard, Anna)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Celia Howard on behalf of Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. (Howard, Anna)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. (Hermann, Kimberly)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 12/13/19. (bnw)
December 13, 2019 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons approved by JPB. (bnw)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons United States Attorney, #2 Summons United States Attorney General)(ah)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. (ah)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9168222). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. v. United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Samuel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Stewart Hermann
Represented By: Anna Celia Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?