United States of America v. $38,507.00 In United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $38,507.00 In United States Currency
Claimant: Quiyontay Sanders
Case Number: 1:2019cv05752
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2020 Filing 11 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 4, 2020 through April 13, 2020 and June 24, 2020 through July 12, 2020, by Michael John Brown. (Brown, Michael)
February 12, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of CLAIM by Quiyontay Sanders. (dob)
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 02/08/2020. (Brown, Michael)
January 23, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to $38507.00 in US Currency arrested on 1/9/2020. (dob)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed on 1/9/2020 for Arrest of $38,507.00 in United States Currency. (dob)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Titana Strong at Atlanta Address (Brown, Michael)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Tatiana Strong at Fairburn Address (Brown, Michael)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint For Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Quiyontay Sanders at Robert A. Deyton Detention (Brown, Michael)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 Warrant for Arrest in Rem re: $38507.00 in United States Currency. (dob)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 1/6/2020. (dob)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture filed by United States of America. Warrant of arrest and notice of seizure issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $38,507.00 In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $38,507.00 In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael John Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Quiyontay Sanders
Represented By: Albert Andre Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?