Burse v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Tony Burse
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv05769
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 1/16/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
January 15, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Kenneth R. Hiller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9251813).. Attorney Kenneth R Hiller added appearing on behalf of Tony Burse (pmb)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Kenneth R. Hiller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9251813).by Tony Burse. (Flynn, Kathleen) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Electronically Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ddm)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Tony Burse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibits B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Counsel for Plaintiff is appointed to effect service of process upon Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 1/2/20. (ddm)
December 27, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (jap)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tony Burse. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Summons Proposed-General Counsel-Not Issued, #5 Summons Proposed-Attorney General-Not Issued, #6 Summons Proposed-US Attorney-Not Issued, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burse v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Burse
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Flynn
Represented By: Kenneth R Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?