Williams v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA et al
Plaintiff: Terrence E. Williams
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05856
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (anc)
February 12, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Terrence E. Williams re #7 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #8 Clerk's Judgment. (anc)
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants (anc)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 2/12/2020. (anc)
January 30, 2020 Submission of #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (anc)
January 16, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Terrence E. Williams re #6 Order (anc)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Stay Pre-Trial Deadlines and Discovery pending resolution of the Defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/16/2020. (anc)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Pretrial and Discovery Deadlines by JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Scott, Monika)
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with Brief In Support by JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Scott, Monika)
January 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Terrence E. Williams re #3 Order on Motion for TRO. (anc)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/2/2020. (anc)
December 31, 2019 Submission of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (anc)
December 31, 2019 Filing 2 Emergency Ex-Parte MOTION and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction by Terrence E. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(anc)
December 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and TRO Request with COMPLAINT. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9222337) filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(anc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
Represented By: Monika Vyas Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Monika Vyas Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence E. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?