Stallion Oilfield Construction, LLC et al v. Custom Ecology, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stallion Oilfield Construction, LLC and Stallion Oilfield Services Ltd.
Defendant: Custom Ecology, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019mi00100
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Miscellaneous Case Terminated. (eop)
July 17, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (eop)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Stallion Oilfield Construction, LLC, Stallion Oilfield Services Ltd. (Stastny, Anthony)
July 1, 2019 Submission of #1 MOTION to Compel Subpoena; and MOTION to Transfer Case to USDC Louisiana: and #6 AMENDED MOTION to Compel Complaince, for Contempt and to transfer, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (eop)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 Amended MOTION for Contempt with Brief In Support by Stallion Oilfield Construction, LLC, Stallion Oilfield Services Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of attempt to confer/resolve, #2 Brief Brief in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Brief in Support, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Brief in Support, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Brief in Support, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Brief in Support, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Brief in Support, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Brief in Support, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Brief in Support, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Brief in Support, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Brief in Support, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Brief in Support, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to Brief in Support, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12 to Brief in Support, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 13 to Brief in Support, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 14 to Brief in Support)(Stastny, Anthony)
June 25, 2019 Refund in the amount of $47.00 has been processed, effective 6/25/2019 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Dean A. Cole; granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Bradley Lance Person. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 06/25/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rvb)
June 24, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Bradley Lance Person Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8738104). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Bradley Lance Person added appearing on behalf of Stallion Oilfield Construction, LLC, Stallion Oilfield Services Ltd. (pmb)
June 24, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Dean A. Cole Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8738061). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Dean A. Cole added appearing on behalf of Stallion Oilfield Construction, LLC, Stallion Oilfield Services Ltd. (pmb)
June 19, 2019 Clerks Approval re #3 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Bradley Lance Person Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8738104). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Stallion Oilfield Construction, LLC, Stallion Oilfield Services Ltd.. (Stastny, Anthony)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Dean A. Cole Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8738061). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Stallion Oilfield Construction, LLC, Stallion Oilfield Services Ltd.. (Stastny, Anthony)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-8721991. (Stastny, Anthony)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stallion Oilfield Construction, LLC and Stallion Oilfield Services Ltd. identifying Other Affiliates: Stallion Interests, LLC, Stallion Oilfield Services, LLC, and Stallion Oilfield Holdings, Inc. for Stallion Oilfield Services Ltd.. (eop)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel Compliance of the Subpoena and for Contempt; and MOTION to Transfer Case to USDC Western District of Louisiana and with Brief In Support by Stallion Oilfield Construction, LLC and Stallion Oilfield Services Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Certification of Rule 37, #2 Brief in Support, #3 Exhibit -1, #4 Exhibit -2, #5 Exhibit -3, #6 Exhibit -4, #7 Exhibit -5, #8 Exhibit -6, #9 Exhibit -7, #10 Exhibit -8, #11 Exhibit -9, #12 Exhibit -10, #13 Exhibit -11, #14 Exhibit -12, #15 Exhibit -13, #16 Exhibit -14)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stallion Oilfield Construction, LLC et al v. Custom Ecology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stallion Oilfield Construction, LLC
Represented By: Anthony C. Stastny
Represented By: Dean A. Cole
Represented By: Bradley Lance Person
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stallion Oilfield Services Ltd.
Represented By: Anthony C. Stastny
Represented By: Dean A. Cole
Represented By: Bradley Lance Person
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Custom Ecology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?