Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund v. All Service Insulation Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund
Defendant: All Service Insulation Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019mi00135
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Referring Judge: Russell G Vineyard
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1963
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Submission of #3 Application for Writ (Garnishee: Bank of America); #4 Application for Writ (Garnishee: F&S Mechanical and Plumbing Service, Inc.); and #5 Application for Writ (Garnishee: Art Plumbing Co., to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (eop)
October 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Steve C. Jones and Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-mi-135-SCJ-RGV. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (eop)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment (Garnishee: Art Plumbing Co.) by Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for Garnishment on Judgment, #2 Proposed Writ of Garnishment on Judgment, #3 Proposed Notice to Defendant of Issuance of Writ of Garnishment)(Warren, Tessa) Modified text on 10/16/2019 (eop).
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment (F&S Mechanical and Plumbing Service, Inc.) by Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for Garnishment on Judgment, #2 Proposed Writ of Garnishment on Judgment, #3 Proposed Notice to Defendant of Issuance of Writ of Garnishment)(Warren, Tessa) Modified text on 10/16/2019 (eop).
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment (Garnishee: Bank of America) by Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for Garnishment on Judgment, #2 Proposed Writ of Garnishment on Judgment, #3 Proposed Notice to Defendant of Issuance of Writ of Garnishment)(Warren, Tessa) Modified text on 10/16/2019 (eop).
September 19, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund; Original Writ returned to Attorney Tessa Addie-Lee Warren. (eop)
September 19, 2019 WRIT of Execution issued in the amount of $26,044.93 in favor of Plaintiffs, Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund and against Defendant, All Service Insulation Company, LLC. (eop)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Writ of of Execution by Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund. (Warren, Tessa)
September 3, 2019 Miscellaneous Case Terminated. (eop)
September 3, 2019 Filing Fee Paid: $ 47.00, receipt number GAN100115423 (eop)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment filed by Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund. Judgment filed 5/10/19 in USDC Maryland and entered in favor of Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund and against All Service Insulation Company, LLC in the amount of $26,044.93. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit -Letter, #3 Exhibit - Envelope)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund v. All Service Insulation Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Service Insulation Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund
Represented By: Tessa Addie-Lee Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?