Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V. v. TEC Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V.
Defendant: TEC Holdings, Inc.
Petitioner: Radiological Service Training Institute
Case Number: 1:2019mi00142
Filed: September 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Referring Judge: Linda T Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - The Court, having considered Philips' Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time ("Motion"), finds that the Motion should be GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Philips' deadline to file its Response in Opposition to RSTFs Motion to Quash, presently November 14, 2019, shall be extended by an additional thirty (30) days, up to and including December 16, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 10/30/2019. (tcc)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 SECOND CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time Respond re: #1 MOTION to Quash SubpoenaMOTION Modify by Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Cornwell, Dorothy) Modified text on 10/30/2019 (eop).
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time through 11/14/19 for Philips to file its response to RSTI's #1 MOTION to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 10/10/19. (jpa)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time File a Response re: #1 MOTION to Quash SubpoenaMOTION Modify by Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cornwell, Dorothy)
October 1, 2019 Submission of #1 MOTION of Third Party Witness to Quash Subpoena; and or MOTION to Modify Subpoena, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (eop)
October 1, 2019 Filing Fee Paid: $ 47.00, receipt number GAN100115958 (eop)
September 26, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION of Third Party Witness to Quash Subpoena; or MOTION to Modify Subpoena by Radiological Service Training Institute. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit -Letter)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V. v. TEC Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEC Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Radiological Service Training Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?