Cvent, Inc. v. Nth Degree, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cvent, Inc.
Defendant: Nth Degree, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019mi00143
Filed: September 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion for Order Compelling Compliance with Non-Party Subpoena. Defendant Nth Degree SHALL fully comply with the subpoena referenced in Cvent's motion to compel within thirty (30) days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 11/20/19. (eop)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Cvent, Inc. of Defendant's Noncompliance with Court Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 10/1/19 Email from Gavin Appleby, #2 Exhibit B - 10/2/19 Service Letter to Gavin Appleby, #3 Exhibit C - 10/25/19 Letter to Gavin Appleby, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Slovensky, Lawrence)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - The Court ORDERS Nth Degree TO SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING within the FOURTEEN DAYS following the entry of this Order why it should not be compelled to fully comply with the subpoena or be held in contempt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 10/24/2019. (tcc)
October 18, 2019 Submission of the #1 MOTION to Compel Subpoena to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (aaq)
October 18, 2019 Refund in the amount of $47.00 has been processed, effective 10/18/2019 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
October 17, 2019 Clerks Approval re #2 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-8965298. (Slovensky, Lawrence)
September 26, 2019 Filing Fee Paid: $ 47.00, receipt number AGANDC-8965327 (eop)
September 26, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Order Compelling Compliance with Non-Party Subpoena with Memorandum In Support by Cvent, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vaughan G. Pedersen, #2 Exhibit -1 -Notice, #3 Exhibit -2 -Subpoena, #4 Exhibit -3 -McCue Email, #5 Exhibit -4 -Search Terms, #6 Exhibit -5 -Appleby Email, #7 Exhibit -6 -Pedersen Email, #8 Exhibit -7 - Demand Letter, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Modified text on 10/1/2019 (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cvent, Inc. v. Nth Degree, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cvent, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Albert Slovensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nth Degree, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?