Shugart v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: John Robert Shugart
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Quicken Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00330
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Referring Judge: Walter E Johnson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Docketed to set answer deadline per #3 - WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Robert Shugart. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver mailed on 1/29/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (ddm)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Robert Shugart. (Erkenbrack, Joseph)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Robert Shugart. Quicken Loans, Inc. waiver mailed on 1/29/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Erkenbrack, Joseph)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by John Robert Shugart with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9295673) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shugart v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Robert Shugart
Represented By: Joseph Lewis Erkenbrack
Represented By: Adam Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?