LawHQ, LLC et al v. Frederick
Plaintiff: LawHQ, LLC and Thomas Alvord
Defendant: Paula J. Frederick
Case Number: 1:2020cv00335
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Rebecca Evans. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 02/07/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rvb)
February 6, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Rebecca Evans Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9318500).. Attorney Rebecca Evans added appearing on behalf of Thomas Alvord, LawHQ, LLC (pmb)
February 6, 2020 RETURN of #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory Beck Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9318602). to attorney for correction re: address. (pmb)
February 3, 2020 Refund in the amount of $400.00 has been processed, effective 2/3/2020 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
January 31, 2020 Clerks Approval re #6 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
January 30, 2020 Filing 6 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-9296678. (Tokajer, Matthew)
January 30, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory Beck Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9318602).by Thomas Alvord, LawHQ, LLC. (Tokajer, Matthew) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 30, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Rebecca Evans Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9318500).by Thomas Alvord, LawHQ, LLC. (Tokajer, Matthew) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/29/2020. (jap)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Paula J. Frederick. (eop)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by LawHQ, LLC and Thomas Alvord. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number BGANDC-9296678) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LawHQ, LLC et al v. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula J. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LawHQ, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Tokajer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Alvord
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Tokajer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?