United States of America v. $2,080.00 in United States Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One Ruger 9MM Pistol and $2,080.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 1:2020cv00362
Filed: January 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (ddm)
February 27, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed on 2/4/2020 for Ruger 9MM Pistol, Serial Number 381-56114. (Brown, Michael)
February 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Mailk Malone (Brown, Michael)
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Jason Davis (Brown, Michael)
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Curtio Fredericks (Brown, Michael)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Curtio Fredericks via Attorney Vionnette Johnson (Brown, Michael)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed on 2/4/2020 as to Defendant $2,080.00 in United States Currency. (ddm)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 1/31/20. (bnw)
January 30, 2020 Filing 3 Warrant for Arrest In Rem filed as to $2080.00 In United States Currency. (ddm)
January 30, 2020 Filing 2 Warrant for Arrest In Rem filed as to One Ruger 9MM Pistol/Serial Number 381-56114. (ddm)
January 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $2,080.00 in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Ruger 9MM Pistol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $2,080.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael John Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?