Taylor v. Kemp et al
Plaintiff: Charles Myron Taylor, III
Defendant: Brian P. Kemp, Timothy C. Ward and Reagan Blackhead
Case Number: 1:2020cv00408
Filed: January 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Referring Judge: Linda T Walker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Charles Myron Taylor, III re #6 Clerk's Judgment, #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (tcc)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered denying habeas corpus petition and dismissing action. (tcc)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
February 25, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (tcc)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - After carefully considering the report and recommendation of the magistrate judge, together with the objections thereto, the court receives it with approval and adopts it as the opinion and order of this court, and the petition is DISMISSED pursuant to Rule 4 and a COA is DENIED. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 2/25/2020. (tcc)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE MOTION to Challenge Conviction at Clayton County Superior Court by Charles Myron Taylor, III. (tcc)
February 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Charles Myron Taylor, III re #3 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #2 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (tcc)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Service of #2 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 2/3/2020. (tcc)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order (Contained w/in #2 Final R&R) ORDER - For the purpose of dismissal only, petitioner is hereby GRANTED leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 1/31/2020. (tcc)
February 3, 2020 Filing 2 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDS that the petition be DISMISSED pursuant to Rule 4 and that a COA be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 2/3/2020. (tcc)
January 30, 2020 Submission of #1 Complaint to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker for frivolity and IFP review. (ah)
January 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Charles Myron Taylor, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Kemp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian P. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy C. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reagan Blackhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Myron Taylor, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?